CA SCR37 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Border Patrol Agent Robert Rosas Memorial Highway.
Title
Border Patrol Agent Robert Rosas Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SCR 37 Anderson Senate Third Reading By JONES (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR37 Anderson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR37 Anderson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-14 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2011-07-11 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-11 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2254.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-24 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 952.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-27 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |