CA SCR36 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Yanks Air Museum.
Title
Yanks Air Museum: Yanks Way off ramp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | May 5 hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=scr_36&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/scr_36_bill_20150406_introduced.html |