CA SCR22 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Arab American Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arab American Heritage Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Assembly - SCR 22 Chang Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR22 Chang (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2019.
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-03-21SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 391.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback