CA SCR161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Runaway and Homeless Youth Prevention Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Runaway and Homeless Youth Prevention Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - SCR 161 Wiener Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR161 Wiener et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 186, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-04SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6518.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-09SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5226.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback