CA SCR127 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women’s Equal Pay Day.
Title
Women’s Equal Pay Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR127 Wahab et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3475.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |