CA SCR117 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Vending Day.
Title
National Vending Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - SCR 117 Wiener Senate Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR117 Wiener (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR117 Wiener (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-04-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2024-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4785.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Essayli. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3255.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |