CA SCR116 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Douglas B. Dunaway Memorial Bridge.
Title
Douglas B. Dunaway Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Assembly - SCR 116 Ducheny Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR116 Ducheny (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR116 Ducheny (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-07 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-31 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-30 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6868.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-26 | To Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 26.) | |
2010-08-20 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2010-08-20 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4715.) To Assembly. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-10 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4438.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-08-06 | Set for hearing August 10. | |
2010-08-05 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-06-28 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |