CA SCA6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 15 and 17 of Article II thereof, and by amending Section 10 of Article V thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: recall of state officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |