CA SCA13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 12 of Article I thereof, relating to bail.
Title
Bail: risk of flight exception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | June 14 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Set for hearing June 14. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S., E. & C.A., and APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 13. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |