CA SCA13 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-16 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-16 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending subdivision (c) of Section 2 of Article XIII A thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Property tax: new construction exclusion: small wind
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections, Reapportionmnt and Constitutional Amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-02 | Set for hearing June 16. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 916.) Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing May 13. | |
2009-03-19 | To Coms. on REV. & TAX. and E., R. & C.A. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |