CA SB993 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2585, 2586, 2586.4, and 2586.8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to dietitians.
Title
Healing arts: dietitians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB993 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 993 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB993 Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 993 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB993 Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4643.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6156.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6026.) Ordered to third reading. (Corrected August 18.) |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 7.) |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Corrected April 23.) (Corrected August 7.) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2586 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2586.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2586.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |