CA SB985 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10561, 10562, 10563, and 10573 of, and to add Sections 10561.5 and 10565 to, the Water Code, relating to stormwater.
Title
Stormwater resource planning.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB985 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 985 Pavley Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB985 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 985 Pavley Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB985 Pavley (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 555, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4943.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6542.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (June 17). |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 3598.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3706.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3341.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3214.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10561 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10561.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10565 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10573 | Amended Code | Citation Text |