CA SB984 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-02 - Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-02 - Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 415.11 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to service of process, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Service of process: time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) | |
2010-06-29 | Reconsideration of favorable vote granted in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4167.) | |
2010-06-17 | Set for hearing June 29. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-04-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-09 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |