CA SB979 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1368.7 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.95 of the Insurance Code, relating to health emergencies.
Title
Health emergencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB979 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 979 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB979 Dodd (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 979 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB979 Dodd (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5010.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6001.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3831.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3542.) (April 27). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | April 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1368.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |