CA SB978 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 264.2 of the Penal Code, relating to rape victims.
Title
Rape victims: local rape victim counseling centers: notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Assembly - SB 978 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB978 DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB978 DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5809.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 22). |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 264.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |