CA SB97 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26040, 26043, 26050.2, 26055, 26062, 26062.5, 26210, 26240, 26242, 26244, 26246, and 26248 of, and to add Section 26031.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 11126 of the Government Code, and to add Section 34019.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB97 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 670.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26031.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26040Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26043Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26050.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26055Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26062Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26062.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26210Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26240Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26242Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26244Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26246Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26248Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11126Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34019.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback