CA SB97 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14041.5 of, to add Section 41207.48 to, and to add and repeal Section 84321.61 of, the Education Code, and to amend Item 6870-101-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019), relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: apportionments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB97 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4848.) |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 670.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 14041.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41207.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 84321.61 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |