CA SB965 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 64691.7 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 65001) of Part 2 of Division 22 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Cattle Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB965 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 965 McGuire Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB965 McGuire (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 965 McGuire Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB965 McGuire (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 410, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6410.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5086.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4970.) (May 7). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4513.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 284 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 64691.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 65001 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |