CA SB964 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 127815) of Part 3 of Division 107 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to behavioral health.
Title
Behavioral health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB964 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 964 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB964 Wiener et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 964 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB964 Wiener et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4936.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5948.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3883.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3777.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3539.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | April 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3273.) (March 30). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127815 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |