CA SB963 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1281.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: self-identifying human trafficking system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 10). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1281.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |