CA SB96 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 61049 and 61108 to the Government Code, relating to community services districts.
Title
Fallen Leaf Lake Community Services District Fire Department Protection Act of 2021: elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 61049 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB96 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB96#99INT |