CA SB956 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 17250.55 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: design-build contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-08 - Assembly - SB 956 Cortese Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB956 Cortese (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB956 Cortese (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6249.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4010.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17250.55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |