CA SB956 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 703.140 and 704.105 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Enforcement of money judgments: exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Assembly - SB 956 Wieckowski Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB956 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB956 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5305.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3254.) (March 29). |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 703.140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 704.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |