CA SB953 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6246 to the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas leases: state waters: State Lands Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3517.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | April 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6246 | New Code | See Bill Text |