CA SB952 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17052.13 and 17052.14 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: Fire Safe Home Tax Credits Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Megan Dahle [R] |
Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3865.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |