CA SB952 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33440, 33442, 33443, 33445, and 33446 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: dual language programs: Pathways to Success Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB952 Limón (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB952 Limón (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3836.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3776.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3272.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33442 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33443 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33445 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33446 | Amended Code | Citation Text |