CA SB94 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170.02 of, and to add Section 1172.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Recall and resentencing: special circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB94 Cortese et al (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB94 Cortese et al (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-13 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Kalra. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Kalra. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1160.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 658.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1172.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |