CA SB938 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and renumber the headings of Article 6 (commencing with Section 14765) and Article 7 (commencing with Section 14769) of Chapter 5 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 14769.5) to Chapter 5 of, to repeal Section 14768 of, to repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 14760) of Chapter 5 of, and to repeal and add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 14740) of, Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state records.
Title
State records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 739.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-03-30 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-03-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21. | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14745 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14746 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14755 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14756 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14760 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14765 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14767 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14768 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14769 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14769.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |