CA SB930 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-24 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Haney.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-24 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Haney.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 25631 of, and to add and repeal Section 25634 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: hours of sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 930 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 25 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Wiener (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB930 Wiener (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Haney. |
2022-08-24 | Read third time. Refused passage. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3544.) (April 27). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25631 | New Code | See Bill Text |