CA SB928 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2138 of the Elections Code, and to add Sections 12811.2 and 13005.1 to the Vehicle Code, relating to homeless individuals.
Title
Homeless individuals: voter registration, driver's licenses, and identification cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E. & C.A. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2138 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12811.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13005.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_928&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0901-0950/sb_928_bill_20160201_introduced.html |