CA SB920 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Yee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Yee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2887 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
Alphabetical telephone directories: distribution.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Julia Brownley [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Asm. Mary Salas [D] | Sen. Patricia Wiggins [D] | Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB920 Yee Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB920 Yee (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB920 Yee (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Yee. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 12. Noes 18. Page 3787.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Yee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3787.) | |
2010-05-28 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3593.) | |
2010-05-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-14 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2010-05-13 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-12 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-05-10 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3298.) | |
2010-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-03-23 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-02-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |