CA SB919 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 144 to the Water Code, relating to water resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water resources: stream gages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB919 Dodd (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 26).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4345.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13).
2018-02-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-01-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code144New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code180New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback