CA SB918 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 171b, 171d, 171.5, 171.7, 626.9, 25610, 25850, 26150, 26155, 26165, 26170, 26175, 26185, 26190, 26195, 26200, 26202, 26205, 26210, 26225, 29805, and 30370 of, and to add Sections 25350, 26162, 26206, and 26230 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-01 - Assembly - SB 918 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Jones-Sawyer (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 918 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Jones-Sawyer (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Assembly - SB 918 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Jones-Sawyer Amend By JONES-SAWYER Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB918 Portantino (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 918 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Jones-Sawyer (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Assembly - SB 918 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Jones-Sawyer Amend By JONES-SAWYER Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB918 Portantino (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer. |
2022-08-30 | Read third time. Refused passage. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | June 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3183.) (March 22). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |