CA SB914 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27505, 28210, 28215, 28220, 28230, 29615, 30370, and 30470 of, to add Section 16685 to, and to repeal and add Section 27945 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB914 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 914 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB914 Portantino et al (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 914 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB914 Portantino et al (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 5307.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20). |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3797.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3568.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16685 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30470 | Amended Code | Citation Text |