CA SB912 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 571, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 571, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11005.4 of the Government Code, relating to state agencies.
Title
State property: vending machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 912 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB912 Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB912 Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 571, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 6125.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6). |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 3412.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3091.) (April 8). |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11005.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |