CA SB907 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 49020) to Division 17 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to electronic benefits transfer systems.
Title
Electronic benefits transfer systems: farmers’ markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB907 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 907 Pan Senate Third Reading By Calderon (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB907 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Agriculture] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 907 Pan Senate Third Reading By Calderon (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB907 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Agriculture] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5944.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGRI. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3930.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3774.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3538.) (April 27). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3253.) (March 29). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and AGRI. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 49020 | New Code | See Bill Text |