CA SB900 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 552, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 552, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 321.1 of, and to add Section 750 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: rate case application: safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB900 Hill Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 900 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 900 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 552, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4545.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6047.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3657.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3704.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3078.) (April 1). |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 321.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 750 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 761.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |