CA SB9 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 66452.6 of, and to add Sections 65852.21 and 66411.7 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing development: approvals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB9 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 9 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB9 Atkins et al (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-03 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 16.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 19).
2021-08-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2021-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 22).
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 814.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2021-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-03-03SenateMarch 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-02-24SenateSet for hearing March 18.
2021-01-28SenateReferral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F., and EQ.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65852.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code66411.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code66452.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback