CA SB898 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 16301.3 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: state funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB898 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 898 Cannella Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB898 Cannella (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 898 Cannella Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB898 Cannella (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6231.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5911.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16301.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |