CA SB881 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Set for hearing April 30.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12749.99 to the Water Code, relating to flood control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flood control: County of Santa Clara: South San Francisco Bay Shoreline Project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2018-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code12749.99New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback