CA SB880 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 4651 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB880 Pan Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 880 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB880 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5421.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6310.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code139.43Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code4651New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback