CA SB874 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8265.5, 41320, 41320.1, 41321, 41325, 41326, 41327, 41327.1, 41327.2, 42127.6, 42127.9, 44416, 44418, 46392, 47606.5, 52060, 52061, 52064, 52065, 52066, 52067, 52074, 78222, and 84750.41 of, to add Sections 17463.5 and 66093.4 to, to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 42160) to Part 24 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Section 60810 of, and to repeal and amend Section 313 of, the Education Code, to amend Sections 17581.6 and 17581.97 of the Government Code, to amend Section 28160 of the Vehicle Code, to amend Section 77 of Chapter 15 of the Statutes of 2017, and to amend Sections 131, 133, and 134 of Chapter 32 of the Statutes of 2018, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB874 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-28AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-28AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6705.)
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-08-23AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-08-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6286.)
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-08-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17390Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17457.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17462.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17463Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17463.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code41320Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41320.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41321Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41325Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41326Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41327Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41327.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41327.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42127.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42127.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44416Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44418Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code46392Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47606.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52060Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52061Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52064Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52065Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52066Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52067Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52074Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code60810Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code66093.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code78222Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8265.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84750.41Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17581.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17581.97Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code28160Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback