CA SB873 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-31 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-31 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Budget Act of 2010.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Assembly - SB 873 Hollingsworth Third Reading Urgency By NIELSEN (Y: 25 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB873 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB873 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-31 | From Assembly without further action. | |
2010-08-31 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6899.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 50. Page 6911.) | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-22 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 3273.) To Assembly. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-15 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2010-01-21 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |