CA SB872 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2051.5 and 2060 of, and to add Sections 2061 and 2062 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential property insurance: state of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB872 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 872 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB872 Dodd et al (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-04SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4396.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5172.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 11).
2020-08-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 3793.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3540.) (May 14).
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2020-01-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code2051.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code2060Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code2061New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code2062New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback