CA SB868 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15819.403 of the Government Code, relating to corrections, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Corrections: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB868 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4928.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15819.403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |