CA SB858 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25120 of, and to add Section 21097 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to thermal powerplants.
Title
Thermal powerplants: exemption: emergency backup and standby generators: data centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21097 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB858 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB858 |