CA SB855 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 1367.045 and 1374.721 to, and to repeal and add Section 1374.72 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10144.52 to, and to repeal and add Section 10144.5 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health coverage: mental health or substance abuse disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB855 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3533.) (May 13).
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2020-05-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2020-01-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1367.045New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1374.721New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10144.52New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback