CA SB847 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27802 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: motorcycle: safety helmet exception.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB847 Dahle Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 847 Dahle Senate Third Reading By Megan Dahle (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB847 Dahle (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 847 Dahle Senate Third Reading By Megan Dahle (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB847 Dahle (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2798.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3391.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 27802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |