CA SB844 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 10.5 (commencing with Section 595) of Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 14615) of Chapter 5 of Division 7 of, to add Article 14.5 (commencing with Section 62215) of Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 21 of, and to repeal Sections 596, 14616, and 62216 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Section 13050 of, to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 13278) to Chapter 4 of Division 7 of, and to repeal Sections 13278.1 and 13278.2 of, the Water Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water quality: agricultural safe drinking water fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB844 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-08-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-08-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code14616Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code595New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code596Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code62216Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code100503.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16531.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104161Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104161.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104162.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code105250.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11364.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code120972Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1225Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code123259New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code123260New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1266Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1275.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.35New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1370Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1370.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1372Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13050Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13278New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13278.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Water Code13278.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14105.965Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14149.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14197.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4094Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback