CA SB844 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 16531.1 of, and to add Section 100503.3 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1225, 1266, 1275.3, 11364.7, 104161, 104161.1, 104162.1, and 120972 of, to amend and repeal Sections 121349, 121349.1, 121349.2, and 121349.3 of, to add Sections 105250.1, 123259, and 123260 to, to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 127671) to Part 2 of Division 107 of, and to add and repeal Part 4 (commencing with Section 1000) of Division 1 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 1370, 1370.01, and 1372 of, and to add Chapter 2.8A (commencing with Section 1001.35) to Title 6 of Part 2 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4094 and 14149.9 of, to add Section 14197.5 to, to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 4361) to Part 3 of Division 4 of, and to repeal Section 14105.965 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB844 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100503.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16531.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104161Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104161.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code104162.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code105250.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11364.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code120972Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code121349.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1225Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code123259New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code123260New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1266Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1275.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.35New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1370Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1370.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1372Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14105.965Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14149.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14197.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4094Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback